Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trust - Partial Revocation by Divorce or Annulment
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for the revocation of specified terms of a revocable trust on the absolute divorce of the settlor and the settlor's spouse or the annulment of the marriage occurring after the creation of the settlor's revocable trust, except under specified circumstances; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0451
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0625 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 45
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Second Reading Passed 45
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/31/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM