Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the types of licenses subject to certain restrictions on the number of certain licenses a license holder may hold in Anne Arundel County; altering certain restrictions on the licenses a holder may hold by direct or indirect interest in the county; repealing certain restrictions on certain license holders being issued another license in the county; repealing certain locational requirements for certain additional licenses; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0346
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Licenses
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/18/2020 1:33 PM