Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement - First Responders Killed or Disabled in the Line of Duty Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Ali, Buckel, Frush, Gibson, Jalisi, Mosby, Rose, and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the First Responders Killed or Disabled in the Line of Duty Fund to provide financial assistance to first responders and the families of first responders who are killed or disabled in the line of duty; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; authorizing the Executive Director to make one-time grants to a first responder or the family of a first responder; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Law Enforcement - First Responders Killed or Disabled in the Line of Duty Fund
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-801 through 4-803, 5-303, 5-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM