Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, Bartlett, Barve, Brooks, Cardin, Chang, Dumais, Gaines, Healey, Hettleman, Hornberger, Lierman, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Solomon, Stein, and Sydnor
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing certain requirements technology-based businesses must meet before the Maryland Technology Development Corporation may make certain grants or provide certain equity investment financing; requiring the Corporation to adopt certain regulations related to the investment committee; requiring the Board of Directors of the Corporation to make certain appointments; providing that certain persons are subject to certain public ethics law; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0340
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {935361/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {935361/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Referred Rules 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Text - Chapter - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations
(   10-401, 10-402, 10-403, 10-407, 10-408, 10-409, 10-415, 10-468, 10-469, 10-470, 10-474, 10-475, 10-478, 10-488, 10-489, 10-494 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page