Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permittees - Notice of Sidewalk Closure
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Frick, and Kelly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person who obtains a specified permit from the State Highway Administration for work that will cause a sidewalk to be closed or who does the work associated with the permit to provide, at least 72 hours in advance, written notice of a sidewalk closure to affected business and property owners and post a notice at the work site providing specified information.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM