Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Krebs, and Morgan
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain carriers from prohibiting an enrollee from selecting, or limiting the ability of an enrollee to select, a pharmacy of the enrollee's choice for the receipt of certain services; prohibiting certain carriers, under certain circumstances, from denying a pharmacy the right to participate as a contract provider under a health benefit plan if certain requirements are met or imposing on an enrollee certain payments, fees, reimbursement amounts, limitations, or conditions for certain services; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1527 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy Act
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-2001 through 15-2005, 15-805, 15-806, 15-847 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM