Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0545


CH0243

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners – Cease and Desist Orders and Civil Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Griffith, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Beitzel, Boyce, Buckel, Charkoudian, Corderman, Ebersole, Hartman, Hornberger, Impallaria, Jacobs, Johnson, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Long, Mangione, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Moon, Otto, Palakovich Carr, Parrott, Reilly, Shetty, Shoemaker, Szeliga, C. Watson, R. Watson, Wilson, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 243
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing, on review and approval of the Secretary of Agriculture or the Secretary's designee, the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners to issue a cease and desist order against a person who practices, attempts to practice, or offers to practice veterinary medicine in violation of certain laws or takes certain actions; specifying that a civil penalty imposed under the Act may not exceed $5,000 for a first offense or $10,000 for a second or subsequent offense; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0189
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {990415/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 243
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Practicing Veterinary Medicine Without a License - Cease and Desist Order and Civil Penalty
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation 17
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {990415/1 Adopted 40
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners – Cease and Desist Orders and Civil Penalties
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 243
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-313.2 )
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:14 PM