Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board for purposes of strategic transit planning; providing for the membership, term of office, powers, duties, and staffing of the Board; providing that a member of the Board may not receive compensation, but is entitled to specified reimbursement; requiring the Board to adopt a specified strategic plan and update the plan every 5 years; requiring the Board to submit an annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-203, 7-204, 7-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM