Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Flanagan, Hammen, Krebs, McComas, and Morhaim
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions relating to the Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office; prohibiting a person from bringing an action against a health care provider for a medical injury unless the person provides to the health care provider a specified notice, medical records, and releases at least 90 days in advance of the action; terminating the Health Claims Arbitration Fund; altering the content of specified certificates of a qualified expert; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-920, 3-2A-01, 3-2A-02, 3-2A-03, 3-2A-03A, 3-2A-04, 3-2A-05, 3-2A-06, 3-2A-06A, 3-2A-06B, 3-2A-06C, 3-2A-06D, 3-2A-07, 3-2A-08, 3-2A-08A, 3-2A-09, 3-2A-10 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM