Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified arrearages collected through the Federal Tax Refund Offset Program to be applied in a specified order under specified circumstances; requiring the Child Support Enforcement Administration to provide information to an obligee who receives a specified refund; and requiring the Department of Human Resources to submit a report to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2014, regarding child support collection, why specified options have not been implemented, and the cost of implementing those options.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0812
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-108.8 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM