Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified financial statement required to be submitted by a specified cemetery to the Director of the Office of Cemetery Oversight to contain a balance sheet from the most recent federal tax return filed by the business, or on a form specified by the Director; and repealing the requirement that a specified financial statement contain a specified statement by a certified public accountant and a review of the financial stability of the cemetery by a certified public accountant.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0535
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2016 3/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM