Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
Sponsored by
Caroline County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the salary of the Sheriff of Caroline County to be equal to 80% of the annual salary of the State's Attorney for Caroline County; altering the salary of the Sheriff of Dorchester County to make it 80% of the annual salary of the State's Attorney for Dorchester County; altering the salary of the Sheriff of Kent County to make it 80% of the annual salary of the State's Attorney for Kent County; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0436
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Caroline County - Sheriff - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {140417/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Caroline County - Sheriff - Salary
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {140417/1 Adopted 46A
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46A
Text - Third - Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48C
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
Text - Chapter - Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM