Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Sponsored by
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain assisted living programs to report certain information, on or before June 1 each year, to the Division of Consumer Protection of the Office of the Attorney General; requiring the Office of Health Care Quality within the Maryland Department of Health to refer an allegation of an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice by an assisted living program to the Division of Consumer Protection and the Office of the Inspector General within the Department; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0507
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {986783/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {986783/1 Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Referred Finance 16 Click to view Recorded Media
(   13-4B-01 )
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page