Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Cardin, Frick, Lafferty, Luedtke, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified institutions of higher education in the State to report specified information on the cost of higher education at the institution to specified students.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0607
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {844161/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {844161/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM