Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Water Management - Sediment Control at Large Redevelopment Sites
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Jalisi, Lafferty, R. Lewis and McCray
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a county or municipality from issuing a grading or building permit until the developer submits a grading and sediment control plan approved by the Department of the Environment if the property that is the subject of the permit is, or is included in, a large redevelopment site; requiring the Department to determine specified criteria for large redevelopment sites and to ensure the criteria are as protective of the environment as the criteria required under specified provisions of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0440
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {720113/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Environment - Water Management - Sediment Control at Large Redevelopment Sites
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {720113/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Environment - Water Management - Sediment Control at Large Redevelopment Sites
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Text - Chapter - Environment - Water Management - Sediment Control at Large Redevelopment Sites
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101.1, 4-103, 4-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM