Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Partially Elected School Board
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Anderson, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Hammen, Hayes, Haynes, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, Oaks, B. Robinson, and M. Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the number of members of the Baltimore City School Commissioners; requiring the two elected board members to be elected at large by the voters of Baltimore City; providing for the terms of the appointed and elected members of the Board; requiring the elected members of the Board to be elected at the general election in November 2022 and every 4 years thereafter in accordance with specified provisions of law; providing for the removal of the elected members of the Board; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0310 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {785469/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {723221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {643220/2 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {785469/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 48
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 61A
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {723221/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {643220/2 Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) 65
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-108.1, 3-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM