Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Cullison, Dwyer, Glenn, McComas, A. Miller, Nathan-Pulliam, Rosenberg, and Stocksdale
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of State to establish the Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program for victims of human trafficking; stating the purpose of the Program; establishing eligibility requirements of the Program; establishing application and participation requirements of the Program; requiring an applicant to provide a specified release and waiver of future claims against the State; prohibiting false statements in an application; establishing penalties for a violation of specified provisions of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0818
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1427 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 45
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 44
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-505 )
(   7-301 through 7-312 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM