Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Law School Clinics - Prohibited Activities
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Adams, Beitzel, Fisher, Flanagan, Glass, Hornberger, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Mautz, McKay, Metzgar, Otto, Parrott, Rey, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the law clinic of a law school at a constituent institution of the University System of Maryland from participating in litigation opposing, contesting, or seeking judicial review of an act, a decision, or a determination of a State agency, department, or board.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM