Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, under specified circumstances, the right to compensation for permanent total disability due in part to accidental personal injury or resulting from an occupational disease and payable under specified provisions of law survives to specified individuals under specified circumstances; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0051
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-640, 9-641 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM