Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Flanagan, Adams, Anderton, Bromwell, Carozza, Ciliberti, Kittleman, Mautz, Otto, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the personal property tax persons with specified personal property of $100,000 or less of total assessed value; requiring the State in specified taxable years to remit to each county and municipal corporation a specified amount of the tax the county or municipal corporation would have collected if the exemption under the Act had not been granted; requiring a person to apply annually to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation for the exemption under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 7-245 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM