Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Hill, Jalisi, Kelly, Kipke, Korman, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, A. Miller, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Robinson, Sample-Hughes, M. Washington, West, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each administrator of a hospital to provide patients with a certain patient's bill of rights; requiring each administrator of a hospital to provide certain patients with a translator, an interpreter, or another accommodation to provide certain assistance to patients; requiring each administrator of a hospital to conspicuously post copies of the patient's bill of rights on the hospital's website and in areas of the hospital accessible to patients; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0530
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM