Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County – Speed Limits – Establishment MC 02–21
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (104-27)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing Montgomery County to decrease the maximum speed limit to not less than 15 miles per hour on highways only after performing an engineering and traffic investigation.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Montgomery County – Speed Limits – Establishment MC 02–21
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Montgomery County – Speed Limits – Establishment MC 02–21
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-27)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County – Speed Limits – Establishment MC 02–21
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County – Speed Limits – Establishment MC 02–21
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (104-27) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 10:36 AM
Click to return on the top page