Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - State Correctional Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Barkley, Beitzel, Frick, Glass, Glenn, Haynes, Hornberger, Jackson, McKay, Metzgar, Shoemaker, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the presumption of compensability under the workers' compensation law to include, under specified conditions, State correctional officers who suffer from heart disease or hypertension resulting in partial or total disability or death; requiring current State correctional officers to submit specified medical information to the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services; allowing benefits under the Act to be added to retirement benefits subject to a specified limitation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0411 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-503, 9-628 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM