Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds Transfers
Sponsored by
Delegate Olszewski
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the applicability of provisions of the Maryland Uniform Commercial Code governing funds transfers; providing that the provisions apply to a specified remittance transfer except under specified circumstances; and establishing that, in the event of an inconsistency between an applicable provision of the Maryland Uniform Commercial Code governing funds transfers and an applicable provision of the federal Electronic Fund Transfer Act, the federal law governs to the extent of the inconsistency.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0522
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 31
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Second Reading Passed 31
House 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 33
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 First Reading Finance 32
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4A-101, 4A-102, 4A-104, 4A-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM