Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of Child
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Barkley, Carr, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Frick, Frush, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Hill, Korman, Lam, Morales, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Valderrama, K. Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified units of State government from limiting, to less than 60 days, the aggregate number of days of accrued sick leave that specified employees may use, without certification of illness or disability, for the birth or adoption of their child; prohibiting specified units of State government from limiting to less than 24 weeks, the aggregate number of weeks of family and medical leave that specified employees may use during a specified time period for a specified purpose; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {607774/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-4)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-2)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {607774/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-4) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (131-2) 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-309, 9-1001, 9-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM