Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Restaurants - Meals for Children
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn and B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting to bottled water, low-fat milk, or 100% fruit juice the types of beverages that a restaurant may include in the price of a children's menu of meal options or a meal that is represented as a child's meal; and authorizing a restaurant to offer any nonalcoholic beverage to minors for a charge.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1090 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-304.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM