Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Baltimore City - Prohibition on Sale of Unlawful Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Anderson, Conaway, Mitchell, B. Robinson, and Tarrant
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, in Baltimore City, a person from selling or offering for sale any vehicle, the use of which is prohibited in Baltimore City under any State or local law; and establishing a penalty.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0552 Session: 2008 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-112.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM