Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Less Than 10 Grams of Marijuana - Code Violation
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais and Vallario
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Specifying that a person who violates a provision of law involving the use or possession of marijuana in the amount of 10 grams or more is guilty of the misdemeanor of possession of marijuana; altering a specified provision of law so as to provide that a finding of guilt, rather than a violation, of a provision of law is a civil offense punishable by a fine; establishing procedures for a specified Code violation proceeding; providing that prepayment of a specified fine shall be considered a plea of guilty to a code violation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0495 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601, 5-601.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM