Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and Removal
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Malone, Anderson, Atterbeary, Dumais, McComas, Sanchez, Sydnor, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court to order the removal of a mistreated animal on the conviction of a certain owner or custodian of the animal of an act of animal cruelty; establishing that the ownership of an animal that is ordered to be removed from an owner or a custodian is transferred to a certain impounding agency; requiring an impounding agency to post in a conspicuous place at the location where the animal was seized and removed a certain notice to an animal's owner or custodian; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and Removal
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and Removal
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-615 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM