Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale Advertising
Sponsored by
Delegate Sophocleus (By Request - Anne Arundel County Administration)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that a specified notice of tax sale of property in Anne Arundel County be published in two newspapers published in the county; and requiring the notice to be published on the county's Web site.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0142
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-813 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM