Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program - Eligibility - Lead-Based Paint Affected Properties
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the information required to be provided to the Department of Commerce in order to qualify for certain tax credit enhancements under the Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program to include, with respect to certain qualified opportunity zone business property, a detailed plan for the performance of certain lead hazard reduction activities; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0713
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Text - First - Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program - Eligibility - Lead-Based Paint Affected Properties
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 8:26 AM