Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to award a prevailing plaintiff reasonable attorney's fees and expenses in specified civil actions; authorizing a court to award attorney's fees to a prevailing defendant only under specified circumstances; establishing the method of calculating specified awards of attorney's fees; establishing that the limit on the liability of the State under the Maryland Tort Claims Act does not include a specified award of attorney's fees and expenses; providing that a specified plaintiff is considered a prevailing plaintiff; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0544
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-104, 12-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM