Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches
Sponsored by
Delegates Davis, Aumann, Barkley, Barve, Brooks, Holmes, S. Howard, Kramer, Valderrama, Vaughn, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a motor vehicle manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch from committing specified acts relating to motor vehicle pricing; requiring a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch to ensure that any advertisement it directs to consumers relating to rebate and sales incentive claims meets specified requirements; prohibiting a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch from taking specified punitive or retaliatory actions against specified persons; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0587
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters 27
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-4101 through 14-4107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM