Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a Setoff
Sponsored by
Delegate Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a credit union does not have a lien or a right to a setoff under a specified provision of law if the member has filed for bankruptcy.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a Setoff
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a Setoff
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM