Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Lactation Room - Required
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Barron, Barve, Chang, Conaway, Cullison, Flanagan, Gaines, C. Howard, Kaiser, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Miele, A. Miller, Reznik, Robinson, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the General Assembly to maintain on its premises a private lactation room that may be used by General Assembly members, General Assembly employees, and members of the public to nurse and express breast milk; and requiring that the lactation room include certain items.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Assembly - Lactation Room - Required
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - General Assembly - Lactation Room - Required
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM