Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Healthy Homes Initiative
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of the Environment to establish a Healthy Homes Initiative in the Department for specified purposes; authorizing the Secretary to apply for specified federal grants; and requiring the Secretary to administer specified grants for specified purposes.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0876 Session: 2009 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-855 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM