Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fair Elections Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Korman, Platt, Tarlau, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reforming the system of public financing of campaigns for the offices of Governor and Lieutenant Governor; establishing a Fair Elections Fund; providing for the contents and administration of the Fund; allocating specified fees and penalties that are assessed under the Election Law Article to the Fund; establishing the powers and duties of the State Board with respect to the administration of public campaign financing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0518
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015, January 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/12/2015 Text - First - Fair Elections Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-235, 13-247, 13-306, 13-307, 13-309.1, 13-340, 13-604, 13-604.1, 14-107, 15-101 through 15-111, 15-101 through 15-116, 5-403 )
(   10-208, 2-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM