Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Possession of Loaded Handgun or Regulated Firearm - Enhanced Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Anderson, Dumais, Glenn, Hammen, Hayes, Lierman, McCray, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from wearing, carrying, or transporting a handgun loaded with ammunition on or about the person or in a vehicle under specified circumstances; prohibiting a person from possessing a regulated firearm loaded with ammunition under specified circumstances or if the person is under a specified age; establishing penalties for violations of the Act; requiring the State to comply with the procedures set forth in the Maryland Rules for the indictment and trial of a subsequent offender; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0638
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM