Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Use of Handgun in Crime of Violence or Felony - Statute of Limitations
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who violates a specified provision of law prohibiting using a firearm in the commission of a crime of violence or felony is not covered by the 1-year statute of limitations for a misdemeanor; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0228
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM