Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Afzali, Arentz, Bates, Beitzel, Cane, Conway, Eckardt, Elliott, Fisher, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Holmes, Kach, Kipke, Krebs, McDermott, McIntosh, Mitchell, O'Donnell, Otto, S. Robinson, Rudolph, Smigiel, Stifler, Vitale, and Weir
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from 10 to 25 miles the radius from a farm within which a person may operate on a highway a vehicle registered as a farm area motor vehicle; requiring an applicant for registration of a farm area motor vehicle to submit with the application specified federal tax documentation of active farming status; making the Act an emergency measure; and providing the Act shall remain effective for a period of 5 years from the date it is enacted, after which, the Act shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0221
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {200819/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {200819/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 31
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-935 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM