Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Anderson, Clippinger, Gaines, Gutierrez, Hornberger, A. Miller, Moon, Rosenberg, Smith, Vaughn, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Human Resources to serve in a fiduciary capacity for children in its custody; requiring the Department, in any action, service, or decision on behalf of a child in its custody, to protect and serve the best interest of the child; prohibiting the Department from imposing a debt obligation on a child in its custody or taking any other action that requires the child to pay for the child's own care or custody; requiring the Department to take specified actions when serving as a representative payee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0524
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1270 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-527.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM