Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Diminution in Value of Real Property - Compensation
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Bates, Beitzel, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Haddaway-Riccio, Hough, Impallaria, Jacobs, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, W. Miller, Myers, Norman, Otto, Parrott, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, and Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State to pay just compensation to an owner of real property that experiences a diminution in fair market value as a result of specified land use or development restrictions; requiring a landowner to file a specified claim with the Department of Agriculture in order to apply for just compensation under the Act; requiring the Department to determine the amount of just compensation owed to a specified landowner in a specified manner; providing for the appeal of a specified determination; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM