Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - De Facto Parent
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Frick, Gilchrist, Kaiser, Kelly, Moon, Morales, Platt, Reznik, Rosenberg, Smith, Sydnor, Tarlau, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court, on request of specified parties in specified judicial proceedings, to determine whether an individual is a de facto parent of a child; authorizing an individual asserting de facto parent status to intervene in or initiate a specified judicial proceeding; establishing that an individual who is judicially determined to be a de facto parent has specified duties, rights, and obligations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0402
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM