Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Division of Correction - Revocation of Diminution Credits - Telecommunication Devices
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Barkley, and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Division of Correction to revoke all of the good conduct diminution credits awarded when an inmate violates specified rules regarding a telecommunication device or knowingly possesses or receives a telecommunication device; and prohibiting the Division from restoring specified revoked diminution credits.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1086 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM