Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real-Time Transparency Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Hixson, Korman, Luedtke, Moon, Platt, S. Robinson, Tarlau, and Turner
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a political committee to file a contribution report within 48 hours after receiving a single contribution, transfer, or loan of $1,000 or more during the year of an election in which the political committee is participating; requiring contribution reports to include specified information; providing that contribution reports filed by a political committee are in addition to specified other reports filed by a political committee; providing for a $10 fee for each day or part of a day a contribution report is overdue; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0002
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0185 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-309.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM