Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Atterbeary, Campos, Carr, Cullison, Davis, Kelly, Oaks, B. Robinson, Sophocleus, and Tarlau
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities to provide to specified health occupations boards a list of specified recommended courses in cultural and linguistic competency, health disparities, and health literacy; requiring each board to post a course list prominently on the Boards' Web site, provide information about the recommended courses to health care professionals at the time of license renewal, and advertise the availability of specified courses in specified newsletters and media; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0198
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {216089/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {216089/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-801, 1-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM