Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Hayes, Barron, Hill, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, D. Barnes, Bromwell, Brooks, Carr, Conaway, Cullison, Gaines, Gilchrist, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, C. Howard, Jackson, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, McMillan, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, West, K. Young, P. Young, and R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, except under specified circumstances, the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adjust the rate of reimbursement for community providers each fiscal year by the rate adjustment included in the State budget for that fiscal year; requiring, on or before December 1, 2019, and on or before December 1 annually thereafter, the Department to submit a report to the Governor and General Assembly on the impact of the reimbursement rate adjustment on community providers and other specified outcomes; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0476
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0497 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-201.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM