Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Practice Act - Individuals Exempt From Licensure - Repeal of Criminal History Records Check Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill and Lam
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that, in order to practice medicine without a license while performing specified duties, specified individuals must submit to a criminal history records check in accordance with a specified provision of law; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0633
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {626383/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Practice Act - Individuals Exempt From Licensure - Repeal of Criminal History Records Check Requirement
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {626383/1 Adopted 31
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Practice Act - Individuals Exempt From Licensure - Repeal of Criminal History Records Check Requirement
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 33
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM