Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Fire Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Acevero, Boyce, Bridges, Carr, Charkoudian, D.M. Davis, Hettleman, Hornberger, Johnson, Kelly, Korman, Lehman, Lierman, McComas, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, C. Watson, and Wells
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the use of certain Class B fire fighting foam that contains intentionally added PFAS chemicals for certain testing or training purposes; requiring the use of certain foam for fire fighting training; providing that the Act does not restrict the manufacture, sale, or distribution of certain fire fighting foam or the use of certain fire fighting foam in certain operations; requiring the Department of the Environment to conduct a certain study; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0420
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Fire Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Safety - Fire Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1002 )
Last Updated: 2/10/2020 11:23 AM