Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of Office
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, Bromwell, Brooks, Hill, Jones, Platt, Smith, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution repealing provisions relating to election of circuit court judges; requiring the Governor, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate, to appoint a qualified person to fill a vacancy in the office of a judge of the circuit court; altering the term of office of circuit court judges from 15 to 10 years; requiring the Governor to reappoint a circuit court judge, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate, upon the expiration of the judge's term; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0367
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18B, 2, 21A, 3, 5, 5B )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM